Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Fiorenza

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Siracusa

Titular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1841BornMonreale
24 Sep 186423.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 189554.8AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
22 Jun 189655.3AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
5 Jul 189655.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
11 Dec 190564.8ResignedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
11 Dec 190564.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
27 Jan 192482.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Fiorenza:
Archbishop Giuseppe Fiorenza (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Siracusa

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 531

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013