Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Aguado

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornVelilla
163924.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 167762.6AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
21 Nov 167762.8Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
14 Feb 168873.1DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Aguado:
Bishop Francisco Aguado (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 102
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,511
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 216, Number 1,345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015