Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Fan Yufei

Deceased

Bishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1931Born
29 May 197947.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 198250.4Ordained BishopBishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich], China
5 Apr 199563.6DiedBishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich], China

MicroData Summary for Paul Fan Yufei
Bishop Paul Fan Yufei (born , died ) Bishop of Zhouzhi [Chowchich]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDayingxi

  • a priest for 15.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 22 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 24 Dec 2019

Quantcast