Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Espinosa

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹Born
1588²26.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 160644.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
25 Sep 160644.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
24 Jun 160745.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
16 Jun 163169.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Espinosa
Bishop Tomás Espinosa (born 1562, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLogroño

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 122, Number 780
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast