Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Balaguer Salvador, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1551Born
24 Jan 160351.3AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
10 Nov 160453.1AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
11 Apr 162674.5DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Balaguer Salvador
Bishop Andrés Balaguer Salvador O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Orihuela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Jana

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 74, and Page 265
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 118, Number 749
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast