Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco López de Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567¹BornSegovia
4 Jan 162760.0SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
30 Aug 162760.6ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
9 Jan 162861.0Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
19 Dec 162962.9DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco López de Mendoza:
Bishop Francisco López de Mendoza (died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 182
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 150, Number 955

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015