Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Angulo Gómez de Carvajal, O.S. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Titular Bishop of Coronea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558¹Born
15 Feb 161052.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
15 Feb 161052.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
9 May 161052.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coronea
14 Oct 162668.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Angulo Gómez de Carvajal
Bishop Miguel Angulo Gómez de Carvajal O.S. (born 1558, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasarrubias del Monte

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 125, Number 802
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast