Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Juan de Ribera

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia, Spain

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1532Born
27 May 156230.1AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
30 Apr 156836.1AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
3 Dec 156836.7AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
21 Mar 156937.0InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
6 Jan 161178.7DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
18 Sep 1796Beatified
12 Jun 1960Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Juan de Ribera (VIAF: 25406668)
Archbishop St. Juan de Ribera (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 266
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 73, Number 431
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1562, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast