Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso Francisco Dou

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornBas
3 Sep 166860.6AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
2 Dec 166860.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
15 Apr 167365.2DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alonso Francisco Dou:
Bishop Alonso Francisco Dou (born 1608, died ) Bishop of Gerona

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 194
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,092
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 203, Number 1,272
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015