Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Encabo de la Virgen de Sopetrán, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1740BornJarandilla de la Vera, Spain
1768²27.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
20 Mar 180362.6SelectedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
20 Aug 180464.0ConfirmedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
15 May 180867.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
8 Nov 181878.2DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Encabo de la Virgen de Sopetrán:
Bishop Joaquín Encabo de la Virgen de Sopetrán O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Cebu

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 286
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 127, Number 680
  • bp/op/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 21 Oct 2014