Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodolfo Dulcino

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621¹BornCatanzaro
10 Aug 165635.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 165736.1AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
10 Oct 166443.7DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Dulcino:
Bishop Rodolfo Dulcino (died ) Bishop of Squillace

  • a priest for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 321
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015