Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Joseph Anton Blatter

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1684BornVisp
170823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
18 May 173450.2SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
27 Sep 173450.5ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
21 Nov 173450.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
19 Jan 175267.8DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johann Joseph Anton Blatter:
Bishop Johann Joseph Anton Blatter (born , died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013