Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Ferdinand Holtgreven

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Lycopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1778Born
7 Oct 180123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
22 Jun 184364.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
22 Jun 184364.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
24 Aug 184365.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
29 Sep 184870.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton Ferdinand Holtgreven
Bishop Anton Ferdinand Holtgreven (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBusdorf, Diocese of Paderborn
Ordained BishopCathedral, Paderborn, Diocese of Paderborn

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 246
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1843, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast