Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luca Stella

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jun 1609AppointedBishop of Rethymo, Greece
16 Nov 1615AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
4 Dec 1623AppointedArchbishop of Candia, Greece
24 Nov 1632AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Vicenza, Italy
11 Jul 1639AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Padova {Padua}, Italy
21 Dec 1641DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Stella
Archbishop Luca Stella (died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 368, and Page 207
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 295, and Page 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 276
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast