Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Godefroid Philippe Joseph de La Porte, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Naxos, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1733Born
18 Dec 175623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Nov 179057.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Naxos, Greece
29 Nov 179057.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
10 Jul 179158.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
9 Aug 179663.3SucceededArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
17 Oct 179966.5DiedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece

MicroData Summary for Godefroid Philippe Joseph de La Porte
Archbishop Godefroid Philippe Joseph de La Porte O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop of Naxos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmiens, Diocese of Amiens, France

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 81, and Page 302
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 277
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Dec 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast