Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Dinet

Deceased

Bishop of Mâcon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹Born
28 Sep 162028.7AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
25 Apr 162129.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mâcon, France
3 Oct 165058.7DiedBishop of Mâcon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Dinet
Bishop Louis Dinet (born 1592, died ) Bishop of Mâcon

  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast