Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignaz Anton Demeter

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1773BornAugsburg
21 May 179622.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Augsburg, Germany
10 Aug 179623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
11 May 183662.7SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
21 Nov 183663.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
29 Jan 183763.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
21 Mar 184268.6DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Ignaz Anton Demeter (VIAF: 754379)
Archbishop Ignaz Anton Demeter (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016