Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Ignazio Guiso

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1721³BornCagliari
10 Jun 177251.3SelectedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
7 Sep 177251.6ConfirmedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
15 Nov 177251.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
25 Mar 177857.1DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ignazio Guiso:
Bishop Francesco Ignazio Guiso (born , died ) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

  • a bishop for 5.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1776
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 80
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,488
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015