Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Murphy

Deceased

Bishop of Cloyne, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1789Born
May 1815³25.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 184959.6AppointedBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
16 Sep 184959.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
17 Dec 185061.0AppointedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
4 Dec 185666.9DiedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Timothy Murphy
Bishop Timothy Murphy (born , died ) Bishop of Cloyne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoachford
Ordained BishopPro-Cathedral, Fermoy, Diocese of Cloyne and Ross

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 212
  • b/c2+: CB, 29 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,728
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast