Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Vaughan

Deceased

Bishop of Killaloe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1791²Born
11 Apr 185160.2AppointedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
8 Jun 1851³60.4Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
29 Jul 185968.5DiedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel Vaughan
Bishop Daniel Vaughan (born 1791, died ) Bishop of Killaloe

EventPlace
Ordained BishopNenagh Chapel, Nenagh, Diocese of Killaloe

  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 332
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,644
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast