Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Théophile Georges Kassab

Deceased

Archbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1945Born
6 Oct 197429.3Ordained PriestPriest of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
8 May 199953.9AppointedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
3 Mar 200054.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria
22 Oct 201368.3DiedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk) (Syrian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Théophile Georges Kassab
Archbishop Théophile Georges Kassab (born , died ) Archbishop of Homs (-Hama-Nabk)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZeidal

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,705
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast