Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Athanase Cyrille Georges Dallal

Deceased

Archbishop of Mossul (Syrian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1876BornRasayya al-Vadi, Libya
19 May 190023.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 191235.9AppointedArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
24 Nov 191236.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Baghdad (Syrian), Iraq
31 Jul 192649.8AppointedArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq
14 Dec 195175.2DiedArchbishop of Mossul (Syrian), Iraq

MicroData Summary for Athanase Cyrille Georges Dallal:
Archbishop Athanase Cyrille Georges Dallal (born , died ) Archbishop of Mossul

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1912, Number 74
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Apr 2014