Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Theodore Dalhoff, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bombay, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1837Born
14 Apr 185921.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
25 Dec 186831.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Dec 189154.6AppointedArchbishop of Bombay, India
31 Jan 189254.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bombay, India
12 May 190669.0DiedArchbishop of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for Theodore Dalhoff (VIAF: 315955349)
Archbishop Theodore Dalhoff S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaderborn, Diocese of Paderborn, Germany
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bombay, Archdiocese of Bombay

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Google Books
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 152
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1892, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017