Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salustiano Crespo

Deceased

Bishop of Calabozo, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1826Born
10 Apr 185326.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 May 185326.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Aug 188154.8AppointedBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
30 Oct 188155.0Ordained BishopBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
12 Jul 188861.7DiedBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Salustiano Crespo
Bishop Salustiano Crespo (born , died ) Bishop of Calabozo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio del Tucoyo, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela
Ordained BishopSte Anne, Caracas, Archdiocese of Caracas, Santiago de Venezuela

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 169
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017