Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittore-Maria Corvaia, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy

Titular Bishop of OŽa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1834Born
8 Dec 185622.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
8 Aug 185824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Nov 186329.4Solemn VowsPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1879²44.5AppointedCoadjutor Abbot of Montevergine, Italy
18 Jan 188449.5SucceededAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
31 Jul 190874.1ResignedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
31 Jul 190874.1AppointedTitular Bishop of OŽa
11 Oct 190874.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of OŽa
22 Jul 191379.0DiedAbbot Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vittore-Maria Corvaia
Bishop Vittore-Maria Corvaia O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Montevergine

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopAbbey, Montevergine, Territorial Abbey of Montevergine

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1908, Number 62
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 277
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,891

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast