Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Carranza Salinas, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1567²Born
25 Nov 158316.8ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
30 Mar 162053.2SelectedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
6 Apr 162053.2ConfirmedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
29 Jun 162154.4Ordained BishopBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
29 Feb 163265.1DiedBishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Carranza Salinas
Bishop Pedro Carranza Salinas O. Carm. (born 1567, died ) Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • obp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 139, Number 890
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 344
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast