Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín de Carvajal, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1558BornGuadalajara, México
18 Jul 160546.8AppointedBishop of Panamá
160849.3InstalledBishop of Panamá
7 May 161253.6AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
19 Aug 161859.9DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

MicroData Summary for Agustín de Carvajal:
Bishop Agustín de Carvajal O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 199, and Page 272
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 121, Number 771
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 25 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015