Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Daniele Cardinal Delfino

Deceased

Archbishop of Udine

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1686BornVenice
6 Dec 171428.8AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy
6 Dec 171428.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
7 Apr 171529.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
13 Aug 173448.5SucceededPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
10 Apr 174761.2Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 174761.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
6 Jul 175165.4AppointedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
13 Mar 176276.1DiedArchbishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Daniele Delfino:
Daniele Cardinal Delfino (born , died ) Archbishop of Udine

  • a bishop for 46.9 years
  • a cardinal for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Apr 1747
  • ob/c2: AT, 28 May 2015
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 94, and Page 106
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015