Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdynand Maria von Chotek

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1781³BornWien
24 Nov 180524.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Dec 180524.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 181735.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
14 Apr 181735.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
1 Jun 181735.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
10 Feb 183149.4SelectedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
30 Sep 183150.1ConfirmedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
19 Oct 183150.1SelectedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
24 Feb 183250.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
5 Sep 183655.0DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdynand Maria von Chotek:
Archbishop Ferdynand Maria von Chotek (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,521
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 291, and Page 315
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 359

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013