Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ochoa y Arenas

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1834BornSan Román de Cameros
19 Mar 185824.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Dec 187845.0SelectedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
28 Feb 187945.1ConfirmedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
1 Jun 187945.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
18 Feb 189662.1DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ochoa y Arenas:
Bishop Antonio Ochoa y Arenas (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 510

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013