Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás de Ulloa y Hurtado de Mendoza, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1621²BornLima
9 Jun 167655.4SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
8 Feb 167756.1ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
8 Feb 167756.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Dara
8 Sep 167958.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dara
20 Sep 167958.7SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
27 Nov 167958.9ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
19 Sep 1686³65.7DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolás de Ulloa y Hurtado de Mendoza:
Bishop Nicolás de Ulloa y Hurtado de Mendoza O.S.A. (born 1621, died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 182, and Page 393
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • bd/bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015