Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lelio Morelli

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1586AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
6 Jul 1586Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
1609²DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lelio Morelli
Bishop Lelio Morelli (died 1609) Bishop of Capaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontalto delle Marche, Diocese of Fermo
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCapaccio, Diocese of Capaccio
Buried Place (Original)San Pietro Apostolo, Capaccio, Diocese of Capaccio

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 152
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 25, Number 111
  • c2: AT, 29 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 May 2017