Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Michele Teroni, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1660BornLivourne
18 Sep 168322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
10 Jan 171857.2AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
16 Jan 171857.2Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
Jul 1726³65.7DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Michele Teroni:
Bishop Giovanni Michele Teroni B. (born , died Jul 1726) Bishop of Venosa

  • a priest for 42.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015