Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ugolino Carlini

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1773BornFirenze
10 Jun 179724.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 182956.2AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
2 Aug 182956.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
13 Sep 184774.3DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ugolino Carlini
Bishop Ugolino Carlini (born , died ) Bishop of Cortona

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1829, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016