Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignace-Dominique Grisella de Rosignan

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1689BornConi
28 Oct 172031.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Dec 172031.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 174151.5SelectedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
6 Mar 174151.6ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
23 Apr 174151.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
22 Sep 175667.1DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

MicroData Summary for Ignace-Dominique Grisella de Rosignan:
Bishop Ignace-Dominique Grisella de Rosignan (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015