Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Capezzuti

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1789Born
24 Dec 181324.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 183748.2SelectedBishop of Ariano, Italy
15 Feb 183848.4ConfirmedBishop of Ariano, Italy
11 Mar 183848.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ariano, Italy
22 Jan 185565.3DiedBishop of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Capezzuti
Bishop Francesco Capezzuti (born , died ) Bishop of Ariano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeprano, Archdiocese of Capua
Ordained BishopSan Severino, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1857
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 89
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 8
  • loc: AT, 23 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 Jun 2018

Quantcast