Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Maria Campeggi

Deceased

Bishop of Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1512¹Born
16 Apr 154634.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Feltre, Italy
17 Apr 155947.2SucceededBishop of Feltre, Italy
30 Jul 155947.5Ordained BishopBishop of Feltre, Italy
9 Apr 158472.2DiedBishop of Feltre, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Maria Campeggi (VIAF: 89729643)
Bishop Filippo Maria Campeggi (born 1512, died ) Bishop of Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Diocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSacratissimo Sangue di Cristo, Monastery, Bologna, Diocese of Bologna
Death PlaceFeltre, Diocese of Feltre
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Feltre, Diocese of Feltre

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1546, Number 8*
  • c2+: AT, 2 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast