Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierdonato Cardinal Cesi (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522¹Born
25 Jun 154624.4AppointedAdministrator of Narni, Italy
12 Jul 156644.5ResignedAdministrator of Narni, Italy
17 May 157048.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 157048.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Barbara
16 Jun 157048.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
28 May 158462.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
29 Sep 158664.7DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Pierdonato Cesi (Sr.) (VIAF: 5809319)
Pierdonato Cardinal Cesi (Sr.) (born 1522, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 16.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 253
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1546, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 24 Sep 2017