Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Pacini

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1506Born
24 Aug 155852.0AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
Mar 1559³52.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Mar 1560³53.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
20 Mar 158174.5DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Pacini
Bishop Salvatore Pacini (born , died ) Bishop of Chiusi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColle di Val d'Elsa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 171
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 278
  • b: Treccani.it, 14 Oct 2016
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1558, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast