Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Calvo, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

Titular Bishop of Meloë in Lycia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1739¹BornValencia, Spain
17 Feb 178142.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
17 Feb 178142.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Meloë in Lycia
28 Oct 179051.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Meloë in Lycia
15 Oct 181273.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Calvo
Bishop José Calvo O.P. (born 1739, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 109, Number 566
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 289, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016