Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celestino Puccitelli, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ravello e Scala


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Aug 1637AppointedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
20 Sep 1637Ordained BishopBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy
14 Sep 1641DiedBishop of Ravello e Scala, Italy

MicroData Summary for Celestino Puccitelli:
Bishop Celestino Puccitelli B. (died ) Bishop of Ravello e Scala

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 292
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 99, Number 599

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013