Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Suffield

Deceased

Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jul 1244AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
19 Feb 1245Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
18 May 1257DiedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Suffield
Bishop Walter Suffield (died ) Bishop of Norwich

  • a bishop for 12.2 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 59
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 461
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,579

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast