Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Button

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1248AppointedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
14 Jun 1248Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
3 Apr 1264DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Button:
Bishop William Button (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 60
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013