Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Braun

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia


Events

DateEventTitle
1522Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
4 May 1530AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany
4 May 1530AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
31 Jul 1530Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
13 Aug 1540DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton Braun
Bishop Anton Braun (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Eichstätt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHainsfarth
Ordained BishopEichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt

  • a priest for 18.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 273
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1530, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast