Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Riganti

Deceased

Bishop of Teramo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1666Born
22 Jan 171952.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 171953.0AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
16 Apr 171953.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
3 Nov 172054.6DiedBishop of Teramo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Riganti
Bishop Giuseppe Riganti (born , died ) Bishop of Teramo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMolfetta

  • a priest for 1.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast