Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico de Marzano

Deceased

Bishop of Bova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1678³BornBova
22 Dec 170325.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 171941.2AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
30 Apr 171941.2Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
27 Jul 173557.4AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
24 Jun 175274.4DiedBishop of Bova, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico de Marzano:
Bishop Domenico de Marzano (born , died ) Bishop of Bova

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1752
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 14
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015