Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume Gifford, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1554³BornHants, Staffordshire, Great Britain
22 Oct 161763.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
22 Oct 161763.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
23 Sep 161864.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
5 Dec 162268.6AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
11 Apr 162975.0DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Gifford:
Archbishop Guillaume Gifford O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Reims

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 91, and Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1618, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015