Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal de Bonsi

Deceased

Bishop of Béziers

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554BornFlorence
11 Feb 159844.1AppointedBishop of Béziers, France
30 Sep 159844.7Ordained BishopBishop of Béziers, France
17 Aug 161157.6Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jul 161561.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
3 Mar 162167.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
4 Jul 162167.5DiedBishop of Béziers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Bonsi:
Cardinal Jean de Bonsi (died ) Bishop of Béziers

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
  • a cardinal for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Aug 1611
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 116
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013