Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Maria Bonanno

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1728Born
27 Mar 175122.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Siracusa, Italy
18 Apr 175122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Siracusa, Italy
24 May 180273.9AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
20 Jun 180274.0Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
6 Aug 180678.1DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Maria Bonanno
Bishop Gaetano Maria Bonanno (born , died ) Bishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiracusa

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 33
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast