Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Boldames Ibáñez, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toledo

Titular See: (Juan Tadeo de San Eliseo)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1574BornCalahorra
6 Sep 163258.1AppointedBishop of Ispahan, Iran
6 Sep 163258.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
19 Sep 163258.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ispahan, Iran
5 Sep 163359.1ResignedBishop of Ispahan, Iran
5 Sep 163359.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
163459.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Boldames Ibáñez:
Bishop Juan Boldames Ibáñez O.C.D. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Toledo

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013